This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2018 at 15:16:46 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS JOSE DE JESUS FRAUSTO RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 07/18/2017 OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOSE DE JESUS FRAUSTO RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5586

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

1600 Seaport Blvd Suite 250

Redwood City, CA 94063

Defendant

FRAUSTO RAMIREZ JOSE DE JESUS

Pomona, CA 91766

 

Court Documents

by Diana Chavarria

11/6/2017: by Diana Chavarria

Unknown

11/8/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/08/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

11/8/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/08/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

(Non-Jury Trial)

11/8/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

9/28/2017: Unknown

By Jacqueline Becerra

9/5/2017: By Jacqueline Becerra

Unknown

9/5/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/5/2017: Unknown

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/18/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

7/18/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

7/18/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/08/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 11/08/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. against Defendant Jose De Jesus Frausto Ramirez on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. on 07/18/2017 for the principal amount of $1,054.37 and costs of $95.00 for a total of $1,149.37.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Diana Chavarria; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Jose De Jesus Frausto Ramirez (Defendant); Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/27/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Case reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department A; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Updated -- Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department NE2 to Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/05/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By Jacqueline Becerra; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1170719E0729 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170719E0729 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/05/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Jose De Jesus Frausto Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less