This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2019 at 15:26:10 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS JIMMY VLADIMIR LOPEZ MEMBRENO

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JIMMY VLADIMIR LOPEZ MEMBRENO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0300

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

Defendant

LOPEZ MEMBRENO JIMMY VLADIMIR

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

6/29/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/6/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)

8/10/2016: Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/10/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Without Prejudice); Filed by: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/10/2016 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z Not Held - Vacated by Court on

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: JImmy Vladimir Lopez Membreno (Defendant); Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 06/19/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1160608E1520 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1160608E1520 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department Z

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/10/2016 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: JImmy Vladimir Lopez Membreno (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Acceptance; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less