This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2019 at 15:32:19 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS ISAAC PULIDO

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ISAAC PULIDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0564

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

9100 Whittier Blvd

Pico Rivera, CA 90660

Defendant

PULIDO ISAAC

Pico Rivera, CA 90660

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/30/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

8/30/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - by serving Mia Pulido

7/7/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - by serving Mia Pulido

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/30/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/30/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

8/30/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/30/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/6/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 08/30/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/30/2016 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 08/30/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. against Defendant ISAAC PULIDO on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. on 06/06/2016 for the principal amount of $1,212.44 and costs of $85.00 for a total of $1,297.44.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service by serving Mia Pulido; Filed by: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: ISAAC PULIDO (Defendant); Proof Of Mailing: Yes; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1160615E7044 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1160615E7044 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/30/2016 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: ISAAC PULIDO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Acceptance; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less