This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2018 at 19:18:16 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS GANDY YUDITH GARCIA ROMERO

Case Summary

On 02/03/2017 OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GANDY YUDITH GARCIA ROMERO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TONY L. RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1028

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TONY L. RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

1600 Seaport Blvd Suite 250

Redwood City, CA 94063

Defendant

GARCIA ROMERO GANDY YUDITH

Azusa, CA 91702

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

4/13/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 04/13/2017

4/13/2017: Minute Order of 04/13/2017

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Diana Chavarria

4/13/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Diana Chavarria

Minute Order of 06/12/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

6/12/2017: Minute Order of 06/12/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/12/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/12/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Luz Langarica

6/12/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Luz Langarica

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

2/3/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

2/3/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

2/22/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/21/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/30/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/12/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 06/12/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. against Defendant Gandy Yudith Garcia Romero on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. on 02/22/2017 for the principal amount of $1,097.65 and costs of $95.00 for a total of $1,192.65.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Luz Langarica; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 04/13/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion to 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2017
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Gandy Yudith Garcia Romero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Gandy Yudith Garcia Romero (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/15/2017; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1170203E6924 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170203E6924 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Tony L. Richardson at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Gandy Yudith Garcia Romero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant