This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2018 at 05:13:56 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS FLORENCIO MARTINEZ SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 05/16/2017 OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FLORENCIO MARTINEZ SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3857

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

1600 Seaport Blvd Suite 250

Redwood City, CA 94063

Defendant

MARTINEZ SANCHEZ FLORENCIO

Los Angeles, CA 90063

 

Court Documents

by Areli Sanchez Garay

8/24/2017: by Areli Sanchez Garay

Unknown

8/25/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

8/24/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Sendi Fregoso

7/7/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Sendi Fregoso

Minute Order of 07/07/2017

7/7/2017: Minute Order of 07/07/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/7/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/5/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

5/16/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/16/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

5/16/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/24/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 08/24/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. against Defendant Florencio Martinez Sanchez on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. on 05/16/2017 for the principal amount of $998.82 and costs of $95.00 for a total of $1,093.82.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Areli Sanchez Garay; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/07/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/07/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/24/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Sendi Fregoso; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Florencio Martinez Sanchez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/30/17; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1170517E7132 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170517E7132 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/07/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Florencio Martinez Sanchez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant