Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/10/2017 at 08:45:57 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS EVA KARINA CASTILLEJO SAUCEDO-MAXIMO

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EVA KARINA CASTILLEJO SAUCEDO-MAXIMO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8764

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

Defendant

CASTILLEJO SAUCEDO-MAXIMO EVA KARINA

 

Court Documents

Unknown

11/7/2017: Unknown

Maria Saaucedo Chaves

11/3/2017: Maria Saaucedo Chaves

E-Filing Payment Due

10/18/2017: E-Filing Payment Due

Unknown

10/18/2017: Unknown

E-Filing Receipt of Documents

10/18/2017: E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2017
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service Maria Saaucedo Chaves; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Eva Karina Castillejo Saucedo-Maximo (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/02/17; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Eva Karina Castillejo Saucedo-Maximo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant