Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2017 at 10:43:24 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS ENRIQUE CAMPOS PEREZ

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ENRIQUE CAMPOS PEREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9489

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

Defendant

CAMPOS PEREZ ENRIQUE

 

Court Documents

Unknown

11/16/2017: Unknown

E-Filing Payment Due

10/18/2017: E-Filing Payment Due

Unknown

10/18/2017: Unknown

E-Filing Receipt of Documents

10/18/2017: E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Enrique Campos Perez (Defendant); Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 11/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2017
  • Case assigned to in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/19/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Enrique Campos Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant