This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2018 at 03:17:00 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS EMILIO MARTIN CAN CANUL

Case Summary

On 04/25/2017 OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EMILIO MARTIN CAN CANUL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3188

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

1600 Seaport Blvd Suite 250

Redwood City, CA 94063

Defendant

CAN CANUL EMILIO MARTIN

Los Angeles, CA 90044

 

Court Documents

(Los Angeles)

6/12/2018: (Los Angeles)

(los angeles)

11/6/2017: (los angeles)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/21/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 06/21/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

6/21/2017: Minute Order of 06/21/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/22/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/21/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - SERVED: JOHN DOE, PERSON IN CHARGE

6/1/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - SERVED: JOHN DOE, PERSON IN CHARGE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/23/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

4/25/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/25/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

4/25/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2018
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Writ of Execution (los angeles); Issued by: Clerk; County: los angeles; Principal: 1,787.21; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service SERVED: JOHN DOE, PERSON IN CHARGE: Result: Result Date: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/21/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 06/21/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. against Defendant Emilio Martin Can Canul on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. on 04/25/2017 for the principal amount of $1,632.21 and costs of $155.00 for a total of $1,787.21, joint and several.; Other: Default judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service SERVED: JOHN DOE, PERSON IN CHARGE; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Emilio Martin Can Canul (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/12/17; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Emilio Martin Can Canul (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/12/2017; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1170426E9290 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170426E9290 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Emilio Martin Can Canul (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less