This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2019 at 13:32:46 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS CRISPIN A. GARCIA

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CRISPIN A GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN L. BERMAN and RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0253

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

STEVEN L. BERMAN

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

Defendant

GARCIA CRISPIN A.

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/6/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/29/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 09/29/2016

9/29/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 09/29/2016

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/2/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

8/2/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/2/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2017
  • Case reassigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 09/29/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/29/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 09/29/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/02/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 08/02/2016; Result Type to Not Held - Taken off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/29/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1160607E9391 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1160607E9391 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Steven L. Berman at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/02/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: CRISPIN A. GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Acceptance; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less