This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2019 at 13:46:18 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS JOSEFINA AMAYA

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 OPORTUN INC DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOSEFINA AMAYA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENJI MACHIDA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0298

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENJI MACHIDA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

2190 W Washington Blvd, Unit C

Los Angeles, CA 90018

Defendant

AMAYA JOSEFINA

Los Angeles, CA 90062

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

10/11/2017: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/28/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/28/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/27/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/6/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice of Rejection

9/11/2017: Notice of Rejection

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/13/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - (Amended)

7/7/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - (Amended)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/28/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: OPORTUN INC. DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Updated -- Amended Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 07/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/28/2016 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 07/28/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff OPORTUN INC. DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. against Defendant JOSEFINA AMAYA on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by OPORTUN INC. DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. on 06/06/2016 for the principal amount of $1,485.14 and costs of $70.00 for a total of $1,555.14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: OPORTUN INC. DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: OPORTUN INC. DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: JOSEFINA AMAYA (Defendant); Proof Of Mailing: No; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Amended Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: OPORTUN INC. DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: JOSEFINA AMAYA (Defendant); Proof Of Mailing: Yes; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: OPORTUN INC. DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: JOSEFINA AMAYA (Defendant); Proof Of Mailing: Yes; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1160608E3344 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1160608E3344 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/28/2016 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: OPORTUN INC. DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: JOSEFINA AMAYA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Acceptance; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less