Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2017 at 04:43:04 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS JOSE A ACEVEDO CASTELLANOS

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 OPORTUN INC DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOSE A ACEVEDO CASTELLANOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0275

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

Defendant

ACEVEDO CASTELLANOS JOSE A

 

Court Documents

(Non-Jury Trial)

12/21/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/21/2017

12/21/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/21/2017

Unknown

11/13/2017: Unknown

E-Filing Payment Due

10/18/2017: E-Filing Payment Due

(w/ Fictitious Business Name)

10/18/2017: (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

E-Filing Receipt of Documents

10/18/2017: E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2017
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/21/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 12/21/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. DBA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Oportun Inc. DBA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Oportun Inc. DBA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Jose A Acevedo Castellanos (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/07/2017; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name): Name Extension: (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. DBA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Jose A Acevedo Castellanos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant