Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2020 at 18:41:23 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS JESSIKA IVETH ARGUETA-MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 OPORTUN INC DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JESSIKA IVETH ARGUETA-MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENJI MACHIDA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0175

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENJI MACHIDA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

Defendant

ARGUETA-MARTINEZ JESSIKA IVETH

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/13/2017: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

11/3/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

10/18/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

10/18/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

10/18/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/29/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketRequest for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Oportun Inc. DBA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. DBA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Jessika Iveth Argueta-Martinez (Defendant); Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/29/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name): Name Extension: (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. DBA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Jessika Iveth Argueta-Martinez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant