Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/26/2018 at 14:09:41 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS ALFREDO VERA AYALA

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 OPORTUN INC DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALFREDO VERA AYALA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENJI MACHIDA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0274

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENJI MACHIDA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. DBA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

Defendant

VERA AYALA ALFREDO

 

Court Documents

Unknown

1/16/2018: Unknown

Unknown

11/30/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/30/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/30/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

11/30/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

E-Filing Payment Due

10/18/2017: E-Filing Payment Due

(w/ Fictitious Business Name)

10/18/2017: (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

E-Filing Receipt of Documents

10/18/2017: E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Oportun Inc. DBA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Alfredo Vera Ayala (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/26/17; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/02/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. DBA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. DBA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name): Name Extension: (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. DBA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Alfredo Vera Ayala (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant