Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2020 at 22:28:50 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. VS EVEREST O ODENIGBO

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EVEREST O ODENIGBO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW C. KIM. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0735

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC.

Defendant

ODENIGBO EVEREST O

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNARD ROBERT SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/13/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Statement of the Case - Statement of the Case

10/13/2020: Statement of the Case - Statement of the Case

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/13/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION 1033

10/13/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION 1033

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

10/14/2020: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

8/31/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

8/31/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/31/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketJudgment - Default Judgment By Clerk - Before Trial - 10/14/2020 entered for Plaintiff Onemain Financial Group, LLC, Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services, Inc. against Defendant Everest O Odenigbo. Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Onemain Financial Group, LLC, Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services, Inc. against Defendant Everest O Odenigbo on the Complaint filed by Onemain Financial Group, LLC, Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services, Inc. on 08/31/2020 for the principal amount of $3,790.28 and costs of $312.27 for a total of $4,102.55.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: Onemain Financial Group, LLC, Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Everest O Odenigbo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Onemain Financial Group, LLC, Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Everest O Odenigbo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketStatement of the Case; Filed by: Onemain Financial Group, LLC, Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION 1033; Filed by: Onemain Financial Group, LLC, Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Everest O Odenigbo; On the Complaint filed by Onemain Financial Group, LLC, Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services, Inc. on 08/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Onemain Financial Group, LLC, Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services, Inc. on 08/31/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Onemain Financial Group, LLC, Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services, Inc., does 1 to 10, only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Onemain Financial Group, LLC, Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Everest O Odenigbo (Defendant); Service Date: 09/04/2020; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Onemain Financial Group, LLC, Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Everest O Odenigbo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Onemain Financial Group, LLC, Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Everest O Odenigbo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Onemain Financial Group, LLC, Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Everest O Odenigbo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Andrew C. Kim in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less