This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 23:15:42 (UTC).

ON-CALL ATTORNEY & MESSENGER SERVICES, INC. VS JONATHAN T. DAWSON, ESQ. DOING BUSINESS AS THE LAW OFFICES OF JONATHAN T. DAWSON, A CORPORATION OF UNKNOWN FORM

Case Summary

On 03/23/2018 ON-CALL ATTORNEY MESSENGER SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JONATHAN T DAWSON, ESQ DOING BUSINESS AS THE LAW OFFICES OF JONATHAN T DAWSON, A CORPORATION OF UNKNOWN FORM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICK BROWN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6046

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICK BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ON-CALL ATTORNEY & MESSENGER SERVICES INC.

Defendant

JONATHAN T. DAWSON ESQ. DOING BUSINESS AS THE LAW OFFICES OF JONATHAN T. DAWSON A CORPORATION OF UNKNOWN FORM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIM SHAUN

COHEN BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

3/29/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/30/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

4/30/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/30/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

6/24/2019: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

6/27/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

Complaint

3/23/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/23/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/22/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/25/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/7/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/17/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/23/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/23/2018: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed by: ON-CALL ATTORNEY & MESSENGER SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: JONATHAN T. DAWSON, ESQ. DOING BUSINESS AS THE LAW OFFICES OF JONATHAN T. DAWSON, A CORPORATION OF UNKNOWN FORM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff ON-CALL ATTORNEY & MESSENGER SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION against Defendant JONATHAN T. DAWSON, ESQ. DOING BUSINESS AS THE LAW OFFICES OF JONATHAN T. DAWSON, A CORPORATION OF UNKNOWN FORM on the Complaint filed by ON-CALL ATTORNEY & MESSENGER SERVICES, INC. on 03/23/2018 for the principal amount of $9,290.57, attorney fees of $703.42, interest of $1,156.68, and costs of $407.80 for a total of $11,558.47.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: ON-CALL ATTORNEY & MESSENGER SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: JONATHAN T. DAWSON, ESQ. DOING BUSINESS AS THE LAW OFFICES OF JONATHAN T. DAWSON, A CORPORATION OF UNKNOWN FORM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/31/2019 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Chatsworth Courthouse in Department F43 - Hon. Randy Rhodes; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: ON-CALL ATTORNEY & MESSENGER SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: ON-CALL ATTORNEY & MESSENGER SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Docket; On the Complaint filed by ON-CALL ATTORNEY & MESSENGER SERVICES, INC. on 03/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ON-CALL ATTORNEY & MESSENGER SERVICES, INC. on 03/23/2018, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by ON-CALL ATTORNEY & MESSENGER SERVICES, INC., does 1-50, inclusive

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: ON-CALL ATTORNEY & MESSENGER SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2018
  • Docket; Default not entered as to JONATHAN T. DAWSON, ESQ. DOING BUSINESS AS THE LAW OFFICES OF JONATHAN T. DAWSON, A CORPORATION OF UNKNOWN FORM; On the Complaint filed by ON-CALL ATTORNEY & MESSENGER SERVICES, INC. on 03/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: ON-CALL ATTORNEY & MESSENGER SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: JONATHAN T. DAWSON, ESQ. DOING BUSINESS AS THE LAW OFFICES OF JONATHAN T. DAWSON, A CORPORATION OF UNKNOWN FORM (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/09/2018; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ON-CALL ATTORNEY & MESSENGER SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: JONATHAN T. DAWSON, ESQ. DOING BUSINESS AS THE LAW OFFICES OF JONATHAN T. DAWSON, A CORPORATION OF UNKNOWN FORM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ON-CALL ATTORNEY & MESSENGER SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Rick Brown in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ON CALL LEGAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM SHAUN