Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2021 at 14:23:55 (UTC).

OLIVER O OLUMBA VS CHERYL MANUEL-LYDAY

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 OLIVER O OLUMBA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CHERYL MANUEL-LYDAY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2646

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLUMBA OLIVER O

Defendant

MANUEL-LYDAY CHERYL

 

Court Documents

Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

3/15/2021: Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

3/1/2021: Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/10/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

12/10/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection [Request for Court Order and Answer]

2/23/2021: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection [Request for Court Order and Answer]]

2/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection [Request for Court Order and Answer]]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

2/8/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/23/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

12/23/2020: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

11/24/2020: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims) - Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims)

11/30/2020: Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims) - Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/4/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

12/9/2020: Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/9/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/10/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

12/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/10/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Attorney Client Fee Dispute)

9/24/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Attorney Client Fee Dispute)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Request for Court Order: As To Parties changed from CHERYL MANUEL-LYDAY (Defendant) to CHERYL MANUEL-LYDAY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketOrder on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: CHERYL MANUEL-LYDAY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]: As To Parties: OLIVER O OLUMBA (Plaintiff on defendant's claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/09/2020 at 01:30 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 12/09/2020; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketReceipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: CHERYL MANUEL-LYDAY (Defendant on defendant's claim); As to: OLIVER O OLUMBA (Plaintiff on defendant's claim); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 11/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims); Filed by: CHERYL MANUEL-LYDAY (Defendant on defendant's claim); As to: OLIVER O OLUMBA (Plaintiff on defendant's claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: CHERYL MANUEL-LYDAY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/09/2020 at 01:30 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Attorney Client Fee Dispute); Filed by: OLIVER O OLUMBA (Plaintiff); As to: CHERYL MANUEL-LYDAY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less