This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2022 at 15:43:52 (UTC).

OLGA MUNGUIA, ET AL. VS UGO UVUKA

Case Summary

On 05/02/2019 OLGA MUNGUIA filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UGO UVUKA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4332

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERNANDEZ RAFAEL

MUNGUIA OLGA

MUNGUIA IVAN

Defendants

UVUKA UGO

INTERLAND INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEAGER KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

5/2/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/2/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/2/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/2/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/7/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/30/2020

9/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/30/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

9/30/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence Affidavit of Service

10/1/2019: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence Affidavit of Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

5/6/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) of 05/06/2021

5/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) of 05/06/2021

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re:Opposition to OSC

4/22/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re:Opposition to OSC

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

8/2/2021: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) of 08/02/2021

8/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) of 08/02/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

8/2/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/23/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Olga Munguia, et al. on 05/02/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Olga Munguia, Rafael Hernandez, and Ivan Munguia as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDismissal entered on 08/25/2021, as to entire action is Vacated - Clerical Error.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default or Dismissal scheduled for 11/29/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/05/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Olga Munguia, et al. on 05/02/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Olga Munguia, Rafael Hernandez, and Ivan Munguia as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default or Dismissal scheduled for 11/29/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Olga Munguia, et al. on 05/02/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to Ugo Uvuka

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) of 08/02/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 09/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 /Dismissal scheduled for 05/06/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence Affidavit of Service; Filed by: Olga Munguia (Plaintiff); As to: Ugo Uvuka (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Olga Munguia (Plaintiff); Rafael Hernandez (Plaintiff); Ivan Munguia (Plaintiff); As to: Ugo Uvuka (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Olga Munguia (Plaintiff); Rafael Hernandez (Plaintiff); Ivan Munguia (Plaintiff); As to: Ugo Uvuka (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Olga Munguia (Plaintiff); Rafael Hernandez (Plaintiff); Ivan Munguia (Plaintiff); As to: Ugo Uvuka (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BSW INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEAGER KENNETH