This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2021 at 05:00:04 (UTC).

NUMBER 1 ELECTRIC, INC. VS ALLIANCE MECHANICAL GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 NUMBER 1 ELECTRIC, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALLIANCE MECHANICAL GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7954

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NUMBER 1 ELECTRIC INC.

Defendant

ALLIANCE MECHANICAL GROUP INC.

 

Court Documents

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

9/18/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/18/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

9/18/2020: Complaint - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2023
  • Hearing09/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • Hearing03/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Number 1 Electric, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Alliance Mechanical Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Number 1 Electric, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE MECHANICAL GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NUMBER 1 ELECTRIC INC. is a litigant