This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 09:27:14 (UTC).

NOVAMED SURGERY CENTER OF WHIT VS BARRAGAN, LAWRENCE

Case Summary

On 03/22/2013 NOVAMED SURGERY CENTER OF WHIT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BARRAGAN, LAWRENCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0356

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NOVAMED SURGERY CENTER OF WHITTIER LLC DBA CENTER OF OUTPATIENT SURGERY

Defendant

BARRAGAN LAWRENCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2014
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SE2 , HON. MICHAEL PEARCE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM SE2 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO LAWRENCE BARRAGAN . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/20/13 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SE2 . COSTS OF $ 62.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN DOW471922011. HEARING SET FOR 05/20/13 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. SE2.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NOVAMED SURGERY CENTER OF WHITTIER DBA CENTER FOR OUTPATIENT SURGERY is a litigant