This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2018 at 14:47:54 (UTC).

NORWALK SELF STORAGE, LLC VS ANTON G HAMILTON

Case Summary

On 05/11/2017 NORWALK SELF STORAGE, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANTON G HAMILTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4959

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORWALK SELF STORAGE LLC

11404 Imperial Highway

Norwalk, CA 90650

Defendant

HAMILTON ANTON G

Norwalk, CA 90650

 

Court Documents

Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

5/11/2017: Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

(Non-Jury Trial)

8/1/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

8/1/2017: Unknown

Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

5/11/2017: Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

Unknown

8/1/2017: Unknown

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/24/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/11/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/01/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

8/1/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/01/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: NORWALK SELF STORAGE, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/01/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 08/01/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff NORWALK SELF STORAGE, LLC against Defendant ANTON G HAMILTON on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by NORWALK SELF STORAGE, LLC on 05/11/2017 for the principal amount of $1,131.75 and costs of $75.00 for a total of $1,206.75.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: NORWALK SELF STORAGE, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: ANTON G HAMILTON (Defendant); Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1170516E4571 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170516E4571 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: NORWALK SELF STORAGE, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: ANTON G HAMILTON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.