This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2022 at 06:59:30 (UTC).

NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER, LP VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER, LP filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0706

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER LP

Defendant

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NSIEN IMA E.

Defendant Attorney

CLAYTON JULIA ANN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/18/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

1/18/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/18/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/18/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/4/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/1/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

3/6/2019: Answer - Answer

Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

4/4/2019: Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/17/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/21/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

3/17/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

3/17/2020: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 02/08/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Norwalk Meadows Nursing Center, LP on 01/18/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Norwalk Meadows Nursing Center, LP as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketAddress for Ima E. Nsien (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 02/08/2021 09:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: Status Date changed from 03/16/2020 to 03/17/2020; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/21/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/17/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/17/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Norwalk Meadows Nursing Center, LP (Plaintiff); As to: California Department of Public Health (Defendant); Service Date: 01/29/2019; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Norwalk Meadows Nursing Center, LP (Plaintiff); As to: California Department of Public Health (Defendant); Service Date: 01/29/2019; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Norwalk Meadows Nursing Center, LP (Plaintiff); As to: California Department of Public Health (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Norwalk Meadows Nursing Center, LP (Plaintiff); As to: California Department of Public Health (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Norwalk Meadows Nursing Center, LP (Plaintiff); As to: California Department of Public Health (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less