This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2017 at 09:39:07 (UTC).

NORWALK MANOR HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION VS JORGE ALBERTO SANDOVAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 NORWALK MANOR HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JORGE ALBERTO SANDOVAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5555

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORWALK MANOR HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION

1111 E. Katella Avenue, #200

Orange, CA 92867

Defendants

SANDOVAL ANA LUISA

Norwalk, CA 90650

SANDOVAL JORGE ALBERTO

Norwalk, CA 90650

 

Court Documents

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/17/2017

8/17/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/17/2017

(Non-Jury Trial)

8/17/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/21/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

6/21/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/5/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/17/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/17/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 08/17/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Norwalk Manor Home Owners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Alberto Sandoval (Defendant); Service Cost: 79.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Norwalk Manor Home Owners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Ana Luisa Sandoval (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/16/2017; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Norwalk Manor Home Owners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Alberto Sandoval (Defendant); Ana Luisa Sandoval (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0015355 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/17/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORWALK MANOR HOME OWNERS is a litigant