This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 17:41:59 (UTC).

NORWALK MANOR HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION VS JORGE ALBERTO SANDOVAL

Case Summary

On 12/18/2017 NORWALK MANOR HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JORGE ALBERTO SANDOVAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5048

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORWALK MANOR HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

SANDOVAL ANA LUISA

SANDOVAL JORGE ALBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORE PAMELA ABBOTT

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

7/31/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/4/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/4/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Settlement

4/11/2018: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order re Notice of (Conditional) Settlement of Entire C...) of 04/17/2018

4/17/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order re Notice of (Conditional) Settlement of Entire C...) of 04/17/2018

Minute Order - (Court Order re Notice of (Conditional) Settlement of Entire C...)

4/17/2018: Minute Order - (Court Order re Notice of (Conditional) Settlement of Entire C...)

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

5/4/2018: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Minute Order - (Court Order)

5/4/2018: Minute Order - (Court Order)

Order - Dismissal

5/4/2018: Order - Dismissal

Judgment - Judgment

10/19/2018: Judgment - Judgment

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order JUDGMENT ON STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

10/19/2018: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order JUDGMENT ON STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 10/19/2018

10/19/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 10/19/2018

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

10/19/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

10/19/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Proof of Personal Service

1/4/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - on Complaint

12/18/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/18/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/18/2017: Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Norwalk Manor Home Owners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Alberto Sandoval (Defendant); Ana Luisa Sandoval (Defendant); Costs: 4003.19; Interest: 88.92; Credits: 2115.67; Service Date: 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Norwalk Manor Home Owners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Norwalk Manor Home Owners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Alberto Sandoval (Defendant); Ana Luisa Sandoval (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Order - Dismissal: Result: Vacated; Result Date: 10/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order JUDGMENT ON STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT: Status Date changed from 10/16/2018 to 10/19/2018; As To Parties changed from Ana Luisa Sandoval (Defendant), Jorge Alberto Sandoval (Defendant) to Jorge Alberto Sandoval (Defendant), Ana Luisa Sandoval (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Norwalk Manor Home Owners Association, a nonprofit mutual benefit corporation against Defendant Ana Luisa Sandoval, an individual and Defendant Jorge Alberto Sandoval, an individual on the Complaint filed by Norwalk Manor Home Owners Association on 12/18/2017 for the principal amount of $5,978.35, interest of $262.52, and other $150.00 for a total of $6,390.87.; Other: The amount left over from unpaid monthly assessments less the amount collected to date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketDismissal entered on 05/04/2018, as to entire action is Vacated - .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2017
  • Docket** Case Name changed from NORWALK MANOR HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION, A NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION. vs JORGE ALBERTO SANDOVAL to NORWALK MANOR HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION vs JORGE ALBERTO SANDOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Norwalk Manor Home Owners Association (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from Norwalk Manor Home Owners Association, a nonprofit mutual benefit corporation. to Norwalk Manor Home Owners Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Norwalk Manor Home Owners Association, a nonprofit mutual benefit corporation. (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Alberto Sandoval (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Norwalk Manor Home Owners Association, a nonprofit mutual benefit corporation. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORWALK MANOR HOME OWNERS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE PAMELA ABBOTT