This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2019 at 01:06:20 (UTC).

NORTON TOWNSLEY, ET AL. VS LARRY CAMPOS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/17/2018 NORTON TOWNSLEY filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against LARRY CAMPOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1202

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Petitioners

TOWNSLEY NORTON

BELASCO DAVID

BELASCO JACOBS AND TOWNSLEY LLP

Respondents

CAMPOS LARRY

SNEAKERSKINS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BELASCO DAVID ALLEN

Attorney at Belasco Jacobs & Townsley LLP

6701 Center Dr W Fl 14

Los Angeles, CA 90045

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/29/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award Amended

3/29/2019: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award Amended

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/29/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

4/2/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

4/15/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail *AMENDED*

5/7/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail *AMENDED*

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

6/4/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Judgment - Judgment

6/4/2019: Judgment - Judgment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

6/4/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: to dismiss

6/27/2019: Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: to dismiss

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

11/16/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/16/2018

11/16/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/16/2018

Certificate (name extension) - of Service

8/6/2018: Certificate (name extension) - of Service

Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing

8/6/2018: Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing

Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing

8/3/2018: Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing

Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing

8/2/2018: Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing

Petition (name extension)

7/17/2018: Petition (name extension)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/17/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • Motion re: to dismiss; Filed by: Larry Campos (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Updated -- Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award Amended: Filed By: Belasco Jacobs and Townsley LLP (Petitioner); Result: Granted; Result Date: 06/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Court orders judgment entered for Petitioner Belasco Jacobs and Townsley LLP against Respondent Larry Campos and Respondent Sneakerskins on the Petition filed by Norton Townsley, et al. on 07/17/2018 for the principal amount of $5,021.00 for a total of $5,021.00.; Other: plus 10% interest per annum beginning on May 4, 2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award) of 06/04/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 06/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 06/04/2019; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail *AMENDED*; Filed by: Belasco Jacobs and Townsley LLP (Petitioner); As to: Larry Campos (Respondent); Sneakerskins (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Belasco Jacobs and Townsley LLP (Petitioner); As to: Larry Campos (Respondent); Sneakerskins (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2018
  • Certificate of Service; Filed by: Belasco Jacobs and Townsley LLP (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Hearing on Petition scheduled for 11/20/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Attorney-Client Fee Arbitration Award; Filed by: Norton Townsley (Petitioner); David Belasco (Petitioner); Belasco Jacobs and Townsley LLP (Petitioner); As to: Larry Campos (Respondent); Sneakerskins (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Norton Townsley (Petitioner); David Belasco (Petitioner); Belasco Jacobs and Townsley LLP (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Notice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STCP01202    Hearing Date: January 23, 2020    Dept: 26

Townsley v. Campos, et al.

MOTION TO DISMISS

(??)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Respondent Larry Campos’ Motion to Dismiss Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award is DENIED.

ANALYSIS:

On April 4, 2018, an arbitrator issued an Amended Arbitration Award in favor of Belasco Jacobs & Townsley, LLP and against Larry Campos (“Campos”) and Sneakerskins (“Sneakerskins”) in the sum of $5,021. (Pet., Attach. 6(c).) On September 18, 2018, Petitioners Norton Townsley (“Townsley”), David Belasco (“Belasco”), and Belasco Jacobs & Townsley, LLP (“BJT”) (collectively, “Petitioners”) filed a Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award (the “Petition”) against Respondents Campos and Sneakerskins (collectively, “Respondents”). On March 29, 2019, an Amended Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award (the “Amended Petition”) was filed, naming BJT as the only Petitioner and removing Townsley and Belasco as Petitioners. Following multiple continuances of the hearing, the Court granted the Amended Petition on June 4, 2019. Judgment was entered in favor of Petitioner BJT and against Respondents Campos and Sneakerskins on the same day.

On June 27, 2019, Respondent Campos filed the instant Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award (“the Motion”). On September 23, 2019, Respondent Campos filed a Proof of Hand Delivery of the Motion. On January 8, 2020, Petitioner BJT filed a Motion to Quash and Cancel Hearing in response.

Discussion

The Motion is deficient in a number of respects. First, although a valid proof of service was filed on September 23, 2019, Petitioner BJT contends that it was never served with the complete Motion and accompanying papers. (Motion to Quash, ¶¶1-7.)

Second, the Motion is an untimely challenge to the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award, which was granted and entered as a judgment more than seven months ago. There are two ways Respondent Campos could have challenged the arbitration award. First, he could have filed a Petition to Vacate the Arbitration Award “not later than 100 days after the date of service of a signed copy of the award” on Respondent. (Code Civ. Proc., § 1288.2, subd. (a).) The Amended Petition demonstrates that the Award was served on both parties on April 4, 2018. (Amended Pet., Attach. 6(c).) A Petition to Vacate the Award, therefore, should have been filed and served by July 13, 2018. Alternatively, Respondent Campos could have responded to the Amended Petition within ten (10) days of service. (Code Civ. Proc., § 1290.6.) The Amended Petition was served on Respondents effective March 30, 2019, making a response due by April 9, 2019. Under either of these statutes, Respondent’s challenge to the Petition is untimely.

Third, the Motion is not supported by any legal authority. Under the Cal. Rules of Court, “[t]he memorandum must contain a statement of facts, a concise statement of the law, evidence and arguments relied on, and a discussion of the statutes, cases, and textbooks cited in support of the position advanced.” (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1113, subd. (b).) The failure to cite to any legal authority not only violates the Rules of Court, but also deprives Petitioner BJT of proper notice of the basis of the Motion.

In light of these defects, especially the untimeliness of Respondent’s challenge to the Petition, which cannot be corrected, the Motion to Dismiss is DENIED.

Petitioner to give notice.