This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/08/2021 at 05:05:52 (UTC).

NORTH TOWNE PARK HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION VS TIFFANY FISCHER

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 NORTH TOWNE PARK HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against TIFFANY FISCHER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0250

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTH TOWNE PARK HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

FISCHER TIFFANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDIONI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/3/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/18/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Lis Pendens - Notice of Lis Pendens

3/25/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens - Notice of Lis Pendens

Complaint - Complaint

12/9/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/9/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/9/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2023
  • Hearing12/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Hearing06/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: NORTH TOWNE PARK HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to TIFFANY FISCHER; On the Complaint filed by NORTH TOWNE PARK HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION on 12/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: NORTH TOWNE PARK HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: TIFFANY FISCHER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: NORTH TOWNE PARK HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: TIFFANY FISCHER (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/22/2021; Service Cost: 345.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: NORTH TOWNE PARK HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: TIFFANY FISCHER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NORTH TOWNE PARK HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: TIFFANY FISCHER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: NORTH TOWNE PARK HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: TIFFANY FISCHER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDIONI DANIEL M