This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 02:23:08 (UTC).

NORTH HILLS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT VS MIGUEL CASTRO

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 NORTH HILLS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MIGUEL CASTRO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0880

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTH HILLS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Defendant

CASTRO MIGUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLOYD HARRY EDWARD JR

 

Court Documents

Answer

9/20/2017: Answer

Writ of (name extension) - Possession------Sheriff's

11/9/2017: Writ of (name extension) - Possession------Sheriff's

Application for Writ of Possession

10/31/2017: Application for Writ of Possession

Summons - on Complaint

9/14/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

9/15/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Miguel Castro)

9/15/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Miguel Castro)

Complaint

9/14/2017: Complaint

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

9/14/2017: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/14/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Exhibit List

10/18/2017: Exhibit List

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

10/19/2017: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

10/19/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

10/19/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/18/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/5/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/5/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/5/2017: Proof of Personal Service

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2018
  • Case reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department R - Hon. William D. Dodsoneffective 12/24/2018; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Writ - Return ( Wholly Satisfied); Non-Party; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Writ of Possession------Sheriff's; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Application for Writ of Possession; Filed by: North Hills Property Management (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff North Hills Property Management against Defendant Miguel Castro on the Complaint filed by North Hills Property Management on 09/14/2017 for holdover damages $1,680.00, attorney fees of $500.00, and costs of $285.00 for a total of $2,465.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 16900 Parthenia St., #1, North Hills, CA 91343 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Exhibit List; Filed by: Miguel Castro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Miguel Castro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Answer; Filed by: Miguel Castro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 09/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by: North Hills Property Management (Plaintiff); As to: Miguel Castro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: North Hills Property Management (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William D. Dodson in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • OSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELLER & FLOYD - HARRY E. FLOYD ESQ