This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/12/2012 at 14:30:10 (UTC).

NORMONT TERRACE LP VS BRACKINS, KEYVONA

Case Summary

On 08/27/2012 NORMONT TERRACE LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BRACKINS, KEYVONA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0836

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORMONT TERRACE LP

Defendant

BRACKINS KEYVONA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS, CHRIS

Defendant Attorney

BRACKINS, KEYVONA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2012
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HELD, MINUTE ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL BY COURT'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • STIPULATED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • OSC SET 11/08/12, 0830 AM, DEPT. 88, NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • MOTION FILED: EX PARTE MOTION HEARING SET FOR10/05/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 10/11/12, 01:30 PM, DEPT 88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2012
  • FAILURE TO APPEAR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 09/27/12, 08:30 AM, DEPT 88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION- ORDER TO POST. ANSWER FILED ON 09/07/12 BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less