This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/15/2019 at 04:24:02 (UTC).

NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS JMS AIR CONDITIONING AND APPLIANCE SERVICE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 NORMAN S WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JMS AIR CONDITIONING AND APPLIANCE SERVICE, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9514

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

JMS AIR CONDITIONING AND APPLIANCE SERVICE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LIU PERRY DR.

OGUNADE CHRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLUM HOWARD SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/15/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/15/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

10/15/2019: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/15/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/27/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketAddress for Howard Scott Blum (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company on 10/15/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: JMS Air Conditioning and Appliance Service, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Christina Ogunade (Defendant); Perry Liu, Dr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: JMS Air Conditioning and Appliance Service, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Christina Ogunade (Defendant); Perry Liu, Dr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: JMS Air Conditioning and Appliance Service, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Christina Ogunade (Defendant); Perry Liu, Dr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where JMS AIR CONDITIONING & APPLIANCE SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLUM HOWARD S.