This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/06/2018 at 08:14:29 (UTC).

NORMAN, FOX & CO VS RIGOBERTO BUENROSTRO JR

Case Summary

On 06/30/2017 NORMAN, FOX CO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RIGOBERTO BUENROSTRO JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6516

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORMAN FOX & CO

14970 Don Julian Rd,

City Of Industry, CA 91746

Defendant

BUENROSTRO JR RIGOBERTO DBA IRIS FINISHES

Los Angeles, CA 90502

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/13/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/13/2017

9/13/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/13/2017

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/30/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/13/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 09/13/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: NORMAN, FOX & CO (Plaintiff); As to: RIGOBERTO BUENROSTRO JR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0016530 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Address for RIGOBERTO BUENROSTRO JR (Defendant) clerical correction

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORMAN FOX & CO. is a litigant