This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2019 at 00:44:42 (UTC).

NORMAN, FOX & CO VS CLEAN CHEMICALS MANUFACTURING

Case Summary

On 03/13/2015 NORMAN, FOX CO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CLEAN CHEMICALS MANUFACTURING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS and MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2259

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORMAN FOX & CO

Defendant

CLEAN CHEMICALS MANUFACTURING INC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2017
  • Order CASE FILE DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. SE2 , HON. MICHAEL J. PEARCE PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO. RESPONDENT APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR APPELLANT . APPEAL IS DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO TO 10/14/15 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. SE2 . PARTIES HAVE REACHED A SETTLEMENT. IF NO APPEARANCE ON NEXT COURT DATE, JUDGMENT WILL BE VACATED AND CASE DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO SE2 RE: SCFD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY (NORMAN, FOX & CO) . RECEIPT # DOW402835019 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO ON 07/31/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SE2 OF THE DOWNEY SUPERIOR COURT . CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF APPEAL AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 06/03/15 . FOR (NORMAN, FOX & CO) . AGAINST (CLEAN CHEMICALS MANUFACTURING) INC . PRINCIPAL $ 1971.12 . COSTS $ 125.00 . TOTAL $ 2096.12 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (NORMAN, FOX & CO) , (CLEAN CHEMICALS MANUFACTURING) INC .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SE2 , HON. LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY STEPHEN WALTA . DEFENDANT APPEARING BY JENNIFER NORONHA .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (NORMAN, FOX & CO) , (CLEAN CHEMICALS MANUFACTURING) INC .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • COURT TAKES MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • AFTER SUBMISSION, COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S CLAIM TO PLAINTIFF FILED. SERVED AS TO (NORMAN, FOX & CO) . COSTS OF $ 50.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FILED BY (CLEAN CHEMICALS MANUFACTURING) INC IN THE SUM OF $ 4338.06 , BECAUSE X . RECEIPT # DOW402835008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (CLEAN CHEMICALS MANUFACTURING) INC BY SUB-SERVING WHITE FEM. 57, 5'4, 155 LBS, BRWN EYES, BLACK HAIR . COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO SE2 RE: SMALL CLAIMS FUTURE DATE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN DOW497910018. HEARING SET FOR 06/03/15 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. SE2.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORMAN FOX & CO. is a litigant