This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2019 at 14:59:07 (UTC).

NOBLE ELECTRIC VS PACIFICA DEVELOPMENT & CONSTRUCTION

Case Summary

On 04/06/2016 NOBLE ELECTRIC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PACIFICA DEVELOPMENT CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. LINFIELD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4350

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NOBLE ELECTRIC

Defendant

PACIFICA DEVELOPMENT & CONSTRUCTION

Cross Plaintiff

PACIFICA DEVELOPMENT AND

Cross Defendants

ABEKASIS ARIE

SILVER BRENT MICHAEL

BRENT SILVER CONSTRUCTION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFF OF LESLIE RICHARDS A P C

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFCS/ABDULAZIZ GROSSBART RUDMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/08/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketJUDGMENT SIGNED AND FILED JUDGMENT SIGNED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED-NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED-NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED-NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketCASE NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2016
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DILIGENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • DocketCROSS COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NOBLE ELECTRIC is a litigant

Latest cases where BRENT SILVER CONSTRUCTION INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant