This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2019 at 14:59:01 (UTC).

NOBLE ELECTRIC VS 612 N FULLER LLC

Case Summary

On 04/06/2016 NOBLE ELECTRIC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 612 N FULLER LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4349

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NOBLE ELECTRIC

Defendant

612 N FULLER LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFF OF LESLIE RICHARDS A P C

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/6/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Other Real Property

4/6/2016: Complaint - Other Real Property

Summons

4/6/2016: Summons

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/6/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/06/2017

10/6/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/06/2017

Order - Dismissal

10/6/2017: Order - Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/08/2019 at 08:30 AM in at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketOrder for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to CCP 581(b)(3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/06/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 updated: Result Date to 10/06/2017; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 10/06/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • DocketOSC SET 04/08/19, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - OTHER REAL PROPERTY Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NOBLE ELECTRIC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NOBLE ELECTRIC is a litigant

Latest cases where 612 N FULLER AVE LLC is a litigant