This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/01/2021 at 00:37:28 (UTC).

NITESTAR PRODUCTIONS, INC. VS IFM FILM ASSOCIATES, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 NITESTAR PRODUCTIONS, INC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against IFM FILM ASSOCIATES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3908

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NITESTAR PRODUCTIONS INC.

Respondent

IFM FILM ASSOCIATES INC.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/29/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/7/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/7/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/24/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

11/24/2020: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/24/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

11/24/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Nitestar Productions, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: IFM Film Associates, Inc. (Respondent); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/06/2020; Service Cost: 105.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Nitestar Productions, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: IFM Film Associates, Inc. (Respondent); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/06/2020; Service Cost: 105.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 03/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Nitestar Productions, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: IFM Film Associates, Inc. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nitestar Productions, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: IFM Film Associates, Inc. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by: Nitestar Productions, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: IFM Film Associates, Inc. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCP03908    Hearing Date: March 30, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Tue., March 30, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Nitestar Productions, Inc. v. IFM Firm Associates, Inc.

CASE NUMBER: 20STCP03908 PET. FILED: 11-24-20

NOTICE: NO

PROCEEDINGS: PETITION TO CONFIRM AND CORRECT CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD

MOVING PARTY: Petitioner Nitestar Productions, Inc., in pro per

RESP. PARTY: None

PETITION TO CONFIRM AND CORRECT ARBITRATION AWARD

(CCP § 1285)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petitioner Nitestar Productions, Inc.’s Petition to Confirm and Correct Contractual Arbitration Award is CONTINUED TO MAY 24, 2021 at 10:00a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least five (5) days before the next scheduled hearing, corporate Petitioner must file supplemental papers demonstrating it is being represented by counsel. Failure to do so may result in the Petition being placed off calendar or denied.

SERVICE:

[ ] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) NO

[ ] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) NO

[ ] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) NO

OPPOSITION: None filed as of March 26, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of March 26, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On November 24, 2020, Petitioner Nitestar Productions, Inc., (“Petitioner”) through Jerry Vasilatos (“Vasilatos”) filed the instant Petition to Confirm and Correct Contractual Arbitration Award against Respondent IFM Film Associates, Inc. (“Respondent”). The Petition indicates that Petitioner is a corporation qualified to do business in Illinois. (Pet., ¶ 3(b).) Vasilatos appears to be Petitioner’s owner. (See id., Attach. 8(c).)

A corporation, however, may not appear in court except through licensed counsel. Since the passage of the State Bar Act in 1927, persons may represent their own interests in legal proceedings, but may not represent the interests of another unless they are active members of the State Bar. [Citation.]” (Hansen v. Hansen (2003) 114 Cal.App.4th 618, 621.) An entity must be represented by a lawyer in legal proceedings and may not represent itself (either directly or through a non-lawyer agent) in litigation, as such an act would be the unauthorized practice of law. (See e.g. Caressa Camille, Inc. v. Alcoholic Beverage Control Appeals Bd. (2002) 99 Cal.App.4th 1094, 1101) (corporation); Albion River Watershed Protection Ass’n v. Department of Forestry & Fire Protection (1993) 20 Cal. App. 4th 34, 37 (unincorporated association); Aulisio v. Bancroft (2014) 230 Cal. App. 4th 1518, 1519-20 (trustee for trust).

Should Petitioner wish to continue with this action, it must do so through licensed counsel.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Petitioner Nitestar Productions, Inc.’s Petition to Confirm and Correct Contractual Arbitration Award is CONTINUED TO MAY 25, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least five (5) days before the next scheduled hearing, corporate Petitioner must file supplemental papers demonstrating it is being represented by counsel. Failure to do so may result in the Petition being placed off calendar or denied.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.