This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2021 at 06:51:08 (UTC).

NIRMAL S. SEHMBEY VS MBK MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 NIRMAL S SEHMBEY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MBK MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1566

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEHMBEY NIRMAL S.

Defendants

MBK MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

20033 SATICOY LP

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 12/23/2020

12/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 12/23/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/23/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/18/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

12/29/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/1/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/26/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

2/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/26/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/26/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Nirmal s. Sehmbey on 12/04/2020 as follows: Defendants MBK Management Corporation; 20033 Saticoy LP do not owe the plaintiff Nirmal s. Sehmbey any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/26/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/26/2021 at 01:30 PM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 updated: Result Date to 02/26/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: Status Date changed from 12/04/2020 to 12/29/2020; As To Parties changed from 20033 Saticoy LP (Defendant), MBK Management Corporation (Defendant) to 20033 Saticoy LP (Defendant), MBK Management Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/21/2021 at 03:00 PM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 02/26/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/26/2021 at 01:30 PM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 12/23/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Nirmal s. Sehmbey (Plaintiff); As to: MBK Management Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Nirmal s. Sehmbey (Plaintiff); As to: MBK Management Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/21/2021 at 03:00 PM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNotice Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: MBK Management Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Nirmal s. Sehmbey (Plaintiff); As to: MBK Management Corporation (Defendant); 20033 Saticoy LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 20033 SATICOY LP is a litigant

Latest cases where MBK MANAGEMENT CORPORATION is a litigant