Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2017 at 10:19:07 (UTC).

NIKOLA YAHONTOV VS BRANDON DETROY HAYWOOD

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 NIKOLA YAHONTOV filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRANDON DETROY HAYWOOD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS W. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1271

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DOUGLAS W. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YAHONTOV NIKOLA

Defendant

HAYWOOD BRANDON DETROY

 

Court Documents

Unknown

11/13/2017: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Nikola Yahontov (Plaintiff); As to: Brandon Detroy Haywood (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Nikola Yahontov (Plaintiff); As to: Brandon Detroy Haywood (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Douglas W. Stern in Department S13 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13

    Read MoreRead Less