This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2020 at 03:45:52 (UTC).

NICOLE Y. JACKSON VS CRAFT BEER GUILD DISTRIBUTING OF LOS ANGELES LLC

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 NICOLE Y JACKSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CRAFT BEER GUILD DISTRIBUTING OF LOS ANGELES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0366

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACKSON NICOLE Y.

Huntington Park, CA 90255

Defendant

CRAFT BEER GUILD DISTRIBUTING OF LOS ANGELES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

VOLK AMY

 

Court Documents

Separate Statement - Separate Statement

3/16/2020: Separate Statement - Separate Statement

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/17/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition Opposition to Motion to Compel request for production

12/24/2019: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition Opposition to Motion to Compel request for production

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Motion to Compel Form Interrogatories

12/24/2019: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Motion to Compel Form Interrogatories

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Taking Motion to Compel Form Interrogatories off calendar

1/8/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Taking Motion to Compel Form Interrogatories off calendar

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Non-Opposition to Motions to Compel

10/1/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Non-Opposition to Motions to Compel

Motion to Quash - Motion to Quash Motion to Quash Subpoena for Production of Business Records

8/20/2019: Motion to Quash - Motion to Quash Motion to Quash Subpoena for Production of Business Records

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Hearings Pursuant to Court Order

8/7/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Hearings Pursuant to Court Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/29/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/31/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/31/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Separate Statement - Separate Statement

6/14/2019: Separate Statement - Separate Statement

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

6/17/2019: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Nicole Y. Jackson in Support of Motion for a Deemed Admitted Order, and for Monetary Sanctions Against Defendant Craft Inn

6/17/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Nicole Y. Jackson in Support of Motion for a Deemed Admitted Order, and for Monetary Sanctions Against Defendant Craft Inn

Summons - Summons on Amended Complaint (1st)

3/13/2019: Summons - Summons on Amended Complaint (1st)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/11/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/11/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Nicole Y. Jackson on 03/13/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Nicole Y. Jackson as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for 05/21/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Quash Motion to Quash Subpoena for Production of Business Records scheduled for 07/27/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/14/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Nicole Y. Jackson on 03/13/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Nicole Y. Jackson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal Not Entered: Name Extension: Not Entered; As To Parties changed from Craft Beer Guild Distributing of Los Angeles LLC (Defendant) to Craft Beer Guild Distributing of Los Angeles LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:1972366 resulted in empty message

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by: Nicole Y. Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further responses; Filed by: Nicole Y. Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court): Result Date changed from 04/03/2019 to 01/11/2019; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) -ADDITIONAL COURT FEES; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Nicole Y. Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court): Filed By: Nicole Y. Jackson (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 01/11/2019; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Filed By: Nicole Y. Jackson (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 01/11/2019; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by: Nicole Y. Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC00366    Hearing Date: January 14, 2020    Dept: 94

MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA

(CCP § 1987.1)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Nicole Y. Jackson’s Motion to Quash Subpoena is MOOT and is therefore PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

ANALYSIS:

I. Background & Discussion

On January 11, 2019, Plaintiff Nicole Y. Jackson (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for motor vehicle negligence against Defendant Craft Beer Guild Distributing of Los Angeles, LLC (“Defendant”). On March 13, 2019, Plaintiff filed a First Amended Complaint (“FAC”).

On June 14, 2019, Defendant filed a Motion for an Order Compelling Further Response to Demand for Production of Documents and Request for Monetary Sanctions and a Motion for Order Compelling Further Response to Form Interrogatories and Request for Monetary Sanctions. On June 17, 2019, Plaintiff filed a Motion for Deemed Admitted Order and for Monetary Sanctions. 

On August 20, 2019, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Quash Subpoena (the “Motion”). Plaintiff sought to quash a Deposition Subpoena for Production of Business Records issued to Sanchez Medical Center seeking Plaintiff’s medical records dated August 1, 2019. (Jackson Decl., ¶ 5, Exh. B.) Plaintiff argued that the request was “inherently unnecessary and an attempt to frustrate Plaintiff” because she had already informed Defendant she would produce said medical records by August 31, 2019.

However, the subpoena deadline for production of documents was August 29, 2019. As such, Plaintiff’s Motion is MOOT and is therefore PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

I. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff Nicole Y. Jackson’s Motion to Quash Subpoena is MOOT and is therefore PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Moving party to give notice.

Case Number: 19STLC00366    Hearing Date: January 09, 2020    Dept: 94

MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES; DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED

(CCP §§ 2030.300; 2033.280)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Craft Beer Guild Distributing of Los Angeles, LLC’s Motion To Compel Plaintiff Nicole Y. Jackson’s Further Responses To Form Interrogatories, Set One; Request For Monetary Sanctions is GRANTED AS TO NOS. 102.1, 102.4, 102.5, 108.3, 112.3, AND 112.4.

Defendant’s Motion To Compel Plaintiff Nicole Y. Jackson’s Further Responses To Requests For Production, Set One; Request For Monetary Sanctions is GRANTED AS TO NOS. 1, 2 AND 3, AND DENIED AS TO NO. 5.

FURTHER RESPONSES AND SANCTIONS OF $870.00 ARE DUE TO DEFENSE COUNSEL WITHIN 30 DAYS OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF THIS ORDER.

Plaintiff Nicole Y. Jackson’s Motion To Deem Requests for Admission Admitted is DENIED.

GROUNDS FOR MOTION: Plaintiff should be compelled to provide verified responses to the request for production of documents and form interrogatories. The responses provided are incomplete, inadequate and evasive, and contain meritless objections.

The Court should deem the matters in the requests for admission served on Defendant admitted as it has failed to provide a response.

OPPOSITION:  Plaintiff has sought to work with defense counsel on these discovery issues.

Defendant timely served responses to the Requests for Admission.