Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2017 at 11:08:52 (UTC).

NICOLE SINGER VS PAMELA BRUEHL

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 NICOLE SINGER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PAMELA BRUEHL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4704

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SINGER NICOLE

Calabasas, CA 91302

Defendant

BRUEHL PAMELA

Porter Ranch, CA 91326

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

10/12/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/12/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

10/12/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Minute Order - (Compliance Hearing)

2/17/2017: Minute Order - (Compliance Hearing)

Minute Order of 02/17/2017

2/17/2017: Minute Order of 02/17/2017

Minute Order of 02/01/2017

2/1/2017: Minute Order of 02/01/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

2/1/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/28/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

12/8/2016: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Minute Order of 12/08/2016

12/8/2016: Minute Order of 12/08/2016

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

12/8/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2017
  • Minute Order (Compliance Hearing)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 02/17/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Compliance Hearing scheduled for 02/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 02/17/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Order for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Address for Pamela Bruehl (Defendant) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Compliance Hearing scheduled for 02/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 02/01/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 02/01/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Nicole Singer (Plaintiff); As to: Pamela Bruehl (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/27/16; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: 1161018E7809 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1161018E7809 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/08/2016 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Nicole Singer (Plaintiff); As to: Pamela Bruehl (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less