This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 02:58:32 (UTC).

NICOLE JACKSON VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUTHORITY

Case Summary

On 03/06/2019 NICOLE JACKSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUTHORITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2275

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACKSON NICOLE

Huntington Park, CA 90255

Defendant

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUTHORITY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

11/10/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 11/10/2020

11/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 11/10/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/27/2020

8/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/27/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

8/27/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) -ADDITIONAL COURT FEES

3/11/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) -ADDITIONAL COURT FEES

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/6/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/6/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/6/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/6/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

3/6/2019: Complaint - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • Hearing03/09/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Hearing03/17/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/17/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 11/10/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/10/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/17/2021 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by: Nicole Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/10/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/27/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Nicole Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Nicole Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by: Nicole Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nicole Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC02275    Hearing Date: May 11, 2021    Dept: 54

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Nicole Jackson,

Plaintiff,

Case No.:

19STLC02275

vs.

Tentative Ruling

Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority,

Defendant.

Hearing Date: May 11, 2021

Department 54, Judge Maurice A. Leiter

Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery

Moving Party: Plaintiff Nicole Jackson

Responding Party: Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority

T/R: PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY IS DENIED AS MOOT.

PLAINTIFF’S REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS IS DENIED.

DEFENDANT TO NOTICE.

The Court considers the moving papers and opposition.

“If a party to whom a demand for inspection, copying, testing, or sampling is directed fails to serve a timely response to it. . . [t]he party to whom the demand for inspection, copying, testing, or sampling is directed waives any objection to the demand, including one based on privilege or on the protection for work product. . . . The party making the demand may move for an order compelling response to the demand.” (CCP § 2031.300(a)–(b).)

Plaintiff moves to compel responses to requests for production. Defendant served responses to the subject discovery on March 29, 2021 and a verification of the responses on April 8, 2021. Accordingly, the motion is DENIED as MOOT. Plaintiff’s request for sanctions is DENIED on the grounds that self-represented litigants cannot recover attorney’s fees. (See Kravitz v. Superior Ct. (2001) 91 Cal.App.4th 1015, 1017.)

Case Number: 19STLC02275    Hearing Date: May 10, 2021    Dept: 54

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Nicole Jackson,

Plaintiff,

Case No.:

19STLC02275

vs.

Tentative Ruling

Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority,

Defendant.

Hearing Date: May 10, 2021

Department 54, Judge Maurice A. Leiter

Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery

Moving Party: Plaintiff Nicole Jackson

Responding Party: Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority

T/R: PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY IS DENIED AS MOOT.

PLAINTIFF’S REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS IS DENIED.

DEFENDANT TO NOTICE.

The Court considers the moving papers and opposition.

When timely responses to interrogatories are not received, “[t]he party propounding the interrogatories may move for an order compelling response to the interrogatories.” (CCP § 2030.290(b).)

Plaintiff moves to compel responses to form interrogatories. Defendant served responses to the subject discovery on March 29, 2021 and a verification of the responses on April 8, 2021. Accordingly, the motion is DENIED as MOOT. Plaintiff’s request for sanctions is DENIED on the grounds that self-represented litigants cannot recover attorney’s fees. (See Kravitz v. Superior Ct. (2001) 91 Cal.App.4th 1015, 1017.)

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSIT is a litigant