Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/06/2021 at 06:57:42 (UTC).

NICK KITINSKI VS AMERICAN CLAIMS MANAGEMENT, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 NICK KITINSKI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMERICAN CLAIMS MANAGEMENT, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2677

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KITINSKI NICK

Defendant

AMERICAN CLAIMS MANAGEMENT INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDismissal entered on 01/25/2021, as to entire action is Vacated - Entered on wrong case..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Nick Kitinski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Nick Kitinski on 11/30/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Nick Kitinski as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Nick Kitinski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Nick Kitinski on 11/30/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Nick Kitinski as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Nick Kitinski (Plaintiff); As to: American Claims Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN CLAIMS MANAGEMENT INC. FOR EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant