This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 18:24:23 (UTC).

NICK GRITSONIS VS XPRESS MORTGAGE, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2017 NICK GRITSONIS filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against XPRESS MORTGAGE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5299

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRITSONIS NICK

Defendants

XPRESS MORTGAGE INC.

WEITZ ANDREW

Studio City, CA 91604

DREAM REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS

WEITZ FAY

Studio City, CA 91604

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAKE DAVID NATHAN

Attorney at Law Offices of David N. Lake, APC

16130 Ventura Blvd Ste 650,

Encino, CA 91436

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling - on demurrers

8/10/2018: Notice of Ruling - on demurrers

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil, Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)]

11/7/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil, Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)]

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/26/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Minute Order - (Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike; Hearing on Demu...)

8/9/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike; Hearing on Demu...)

Declaration (name extension) - of Fay Weitz

7/2/2018: Declaration (name extension) - of Fay Weitz

Declaration (name extension) - of Andrew Weitz

7/2/2018: Declaration (name extension) - of Andrew Weitz

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike; Hearing on Demu...) of 06/21/2018

6/21/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike; Hearing on Demu...) of 06/21/2018

Minute Order - (Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike; Hearing on Demu...)

6/21/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike; Hearing on Demu...)

Reply (name extension) - to opposition to demurrer

6/18/2018: Reply (name extension) - to opposition to demurrer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/2/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/17/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/6/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/6/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/6/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - on Complaint

11/15/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

11/15/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/15/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: why sanctions or dismissal of the entire action should not be imposed for failure to appear on the date of Trial scheduled for 09/12/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/15/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 05/15/2019; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil, Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)]; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil: Status Date changed from 08/23/2018 to 10/17/2018; As To Parties: Xpress Mortgage, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Filing of Proof of Service of Signed Order to Be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 12/07/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Nick Gritsonis (Plaintiff); As to: Fay Weitz (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/24/2017; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Nick Gritsonis (Plaintiff); As to: Dream Real Estate Investments (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/24/2017; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Nick Gritsonis (Plaintiff); As to: Xpress Mortgage, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nick Gritsonis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

NOV 1 5 2017

Tel: (818) 788-5100

Fax: (818) 788-5199 Sherrt R. Caeter, Executive Officer/Clers Attorneys for Plaintiff By : & , Beputy

Nick Gritsonis Judi Lara

SUPERIOR COURT FOR THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES 17STLC05299

NICK GRITSONIS, an individual, Case No. * Plaintiff, COMPLAINT FOR: V. 1. FRAUD:; XPRESS MORTGAGE, INC., a California 2. CONVERSION; corporation, DREAM REAL ESTATE 3. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; INVESTMENTS, an entity of unknown type; 4. UNJUST ENRICHMENT FAY WEITZ, an individual; ANDREW 00 WEITZ, an individual; DOES 1 Through 25, ONex™ 10.000° Inclusive, Defendants. JURY TRIAL DEMANDED