This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/31/2019 at 10:39:13 (UTC).

NICHOLS, BOND VS HILL, CYNTHIA

Case Summary

On 04/28/2014 NICHOLS, BOND filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HILL, CYNTHIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5120

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NICHOLS BOND

Defendant

HILL CYNTHIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMONIAN VICKEN I.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2014
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. CM WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED LA COUNTY APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED LA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • DocketHEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL CONCLUDED - JUDGMENT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL CONCLUDED - JUDGMENT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • DocketSTIPULATION JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • DocketWRITTEN STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2014
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 05/27/14, 08:30 AM, DEPT 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • DocketMEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S) * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FILED -RESPONDENT ANSWER FILING FEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • DocketOSC SET 10/27/14, 08:30 AM, DEPT. CLK PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less