This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 04:57:36 (UTC).

NH MANAGEMENT LLC VS VAZQUEZ, PASCALE

Case Summary

On 02/19/2016 NH MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VAZQUEZ, PASCALE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0749

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NH MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendant

VAZQUEZ PASCALE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FEINBERG, LAURENCE JAY

FEINBERG LAURENCE JAY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2016
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketMOTION FILED: EX PARTE MOTION HEARING SET FOR 3/30/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketMOTION RULING ISSUED GRANTED. MOTION TO VACATE ADVANCED TO TODAY AND DENIED. MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF EXECUTION DENIED. DEFENDANT UNABLE TO POST RENT. NOTICE TO BE PROVIDED BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketMOTION RULING ISSUED GRANTED. MOTION TO VACATE ADVANCED TO TODAY AND DENIED. MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF EXECUTION DENIED. DEFENDANT UNABLE TO POST RENT. NOTICE TO BE PROVIDED BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketMOTION RULING ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketMOTION RULING ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketA/C CALENDAR-HEARING DATE DELETED REASON: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FILED -RESPONDENT ANSWER FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL PERSON WHO MAY CLAIM TO OCCUPY THE PREMISES + PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL PERSON WHO MAY CLAIM TO OCCUPY THE PREMISES + FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketDEFAULT FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP DEFAULT FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketMEMO TO SET REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR UNNAMED TENANTS PENDING SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR UNNAMED TENANTS PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketMEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-50 MIN(S) * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketOSC SET 08/17/16, 08:30 AM, DEPT. NWH PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - U.D. RESIDENTIAL Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NH Management Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEINBERG LAURENCE JAY