This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2019 at 11:07:43 (UTC).

NH MANAGEMENT, LLC VS HUMBERTO CRUZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2018 NH MANAGEMENT, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HUMBERTO CRUZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2939

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NH MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendants

CRUZ HUMBERTO

North Hollywood, CA 91606

CRUZ MICHAL

North Hollywood, CA 91606

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEINBERG LAURENCE JAY

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/23/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment By Clerk - Before Trial - 10/23/2018 entered for Plaintiff NH MANAGEMENT, LLC against Defendant MICHAL CRUZ; Defendant HU

10/23/2018: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment By Clerk - Before Trial - 10/23/2018 entered for Plaintiff NH MANAGEMENT, LLC against Defendant MICHAL CRUZ; Defendant HU

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

10/16/2018: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Request for Dismissal

10/12/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/12/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/12/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/12/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/12/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

9/14/2018: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/14/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (HUMBERTO CRUZ)

9/14/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (HUMBERTO CRUZ)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (MICHAL CRUZ)

9/14/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (MICHAL CRUZ)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

9/14/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Summons - on Complaint

9/14/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/14/2018: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2018
  • Case reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department R - Hon. William D. Dodsoneffective 12/21/2018; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: NH MANAGEMENT, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; HUMBERTO CRUZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Default entered as to unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by NH MANAGEMENT, LLC on 09/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment By Clerk - Before Trial - 10/23/2018 entered for Plaintiff NH MANAGEMENT, LLC against Defendant MICHAL CRUZ; Defendant HUMBERTO CRUZ. Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Premise address is amended to 11750 KITTRIDGE STREET, #28, North Hollywood, CA 91606.; Default judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff NH MANAGEMENT, LLC against Defendant MICHAL CRUZ and Defendant HUMBERTO CRUZ on the Complaint filed by NH MANAGEMENT, LLC on 09/14/2018 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 11750 KITTRIDGE STREET, #28, North Hollywood, CA 91606 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: NH MANAGEMENT, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HUMBERTO CRUZ (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/22/2018; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: NH MANAGEMENT, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 09/22/2018; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: NH MANAGEMENT, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2018
  • Default entered as to HUMBERTO CRUZ; MICHAL CRUZ; On the Complaint filed by NH MANAGEMENT, LLC on 09/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: NH MANAGEMENT, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAL CRUZ (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/22/2018; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by: NH MANAGEMENT, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HUMBERTO CRUZ (Defendant); MICHAL CRUZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NH MANAGEMENT, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 09/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G. Cortez in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NH Management Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEINBERG LAURENCE JAY