This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2016 at 22:01:22 (UTC).

NH MANAGEMENT LLC VS. GONZALEZ, EDISON

Case Summary

On 12/10/2014 NH MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GONZALEZ, EDISON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KEVIN C. BRAZILE and H. JAY FORD III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2957

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

Judge

H. JAY FORD III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NH MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendant

GONZALEZ EDISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF LISA F. ROSENTHAL - LISA F. ROSENTHAL ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LISA F. ROSENTHAL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2016
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING AND/OR APPEALABLE ORDER RETURNED AS TO (LISA A. ROSENTHAL, ESQ) DUE TO RETURN TO SENDER NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK , HON. KEVIN C. BRAZILE PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK , HON. KEVIN C. BRAZILE PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: MATTER CONTINUE FOR OSC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR (05/02/16) RETURNED AS TO LISA F. ROSENTHAL, ESQ. LAW OFFICES OF LISA F. ROSENTHAL DUE TO FORWARD TIME EXP. RTN TO SENDER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 05/02/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT CLK . . MATTER CONTINUED FOR OSC HEARING FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM500862023.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WES , HONORABLE H. JAY FORD III .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 06/08/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NH Management Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENTHAL LISA F