This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 10:19:10 (UTC).

NH MANAGEMENT LLC VS GARNICA, DIANA

Case Summary

On 01/20/2017 NH MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GARNICA, DIANA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0240

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NH MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendants

GARNICA DIANA

GARNICA CARLOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FEINBERG, LAURENCE JAY

FEINBERG LAURENCE JAY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • DocketHEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED ISSUED 02/28/17 SENT MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR UNNAMED TENANTS PENDING SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR UNNAMED TENANTS PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketMEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S) * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketMEMO TO SET REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketDISMISSAL AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 10 ONLY FILED DISMISSAL AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 10 ONLY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketDEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS GRANTED IN ACCORDANCE Default and Judgment for all Unnamed Occupants granted in accordance With CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - U.D. RESIDENTIAL Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DocketOSC SET 07/19/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT. NWH PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NH Management Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEINBERG LAURENCE JAY