This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2019 at 00:53:34 (UTC).

NH MANAGEMENT, LLC VS EDINSON GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 02/15/2018 NH MANAGEMENT, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against EDINSON GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0535

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NH MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendant

GONZALEZ EDINSON

North Hollywood, CA 91606

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEINBERG LAURENCE JAY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/6/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/6/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

3/6/2018: Request for Dismissal

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

3/6/2018: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession

3/6/2018: Application for Writ of Possession

Proof of Personal Service

3/6/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Writ of (name extension) - Possession

3/9/2018: Writ of (name extension) - Possession

Application (name extension) - AND ORDER TO VACATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND FOR DISMISSAL

3/21/2018: Application (name extension) - AND ORDER TO VACATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND FOR DISMISSAL

Request for Dismissal

4/9/2018: Request for Dismissal

Writ of - Possession

3/9/2018: Writ of - Possession

Application for Writ of Possession

3/6/2018: Application for Writ of Possession

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

3/6/2018: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Request for Dismissal

3/6/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/6/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/6/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/6/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - on Complaint

2/15/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/15/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2018
  • Case reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department R - Hon. William D. Dodsoneffective 12/24/2018; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Updated -- Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service: Location changed from Civil Clerk's Office to Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: NH Management, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Application AND ORDER TO VACATE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND FOR DISMISSAL; Signed and Filed by: NH Management, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Writ of Possession; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: NH Management, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 02/16/2018; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: NH Management, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Edinson Gonzalez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2018
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff NH Management, LLC against Defendant Edinson Gonzalez, an individual on the Complaint filed by NH Management, LLC on 02/15/2018 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 11750 Kittridge Street, #24, North Hollywood, CA 91606 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: NH Management, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Edinson Gonzalez (Defendant); Service Date: 02/16/2018; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 02/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by: NH Management, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Edinson Gonzalez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NH Management, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G. Cortez in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NH Management Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEINBERG LAURENCE JAY