Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2018 at 03:49:31 (UTC).

NGUYEN, EVELYN VS HUESO, CLARA

Case Summary

On 02/14/2013 NGUYEN, EVELYN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HUESO, CLARA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0159

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NGUYEN EVELYN

Defendant

HUESO CLARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GUERRA, TRACY

GUERRA TRACY

Defendant Attorney

HUESO, CLARA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2013
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. WRIT WHOLLY RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. WRIT WHOLLY UNSATISFIED AS TO POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED CAUSE IS CALLED FOR HEARING ON MOTION OF DEFENDANT, CLARA HUESO, TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT. . THE PARTIES HAVING ENTERED INTO A STIPULATED JUDGMENT, THE MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. . PURSUANT TO STIPULATED JUDGMENT NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 3-29-13 WITHOUT THE NEED TO REPOST THE NOTICE TO VACATE. . RECORD TO REMAIN CONFIDENTIAL. . CERTIFIED COPY OF THIS MINUTE ORDER TO SAN PEDRO SHERIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED CAUSE IS CALLED FOR HEARING ON MOTION OF DEFENDANT, CLARA HUESO, TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT. . THE PARTIES HAVING ENTERED INTO A STIPULATED JUDGMENT, THE MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. . PURSUANT TO STIPULATED JUDGMENT NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 3-29-13 WITHOUT THE NEED TO REPOST THE NOTICE TO VACATE. . RECORD TO REMAIN CONFIDENTIAL. . CERTIFIED COPY OF THIS MINUTE ORDER TO SAN PEDRO SHERIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • STIPULATION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • WRITTEN STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • FEE WAIVER FILED -RESPONDENT ANSWER FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • RESPONSE FILED - MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • MOTION FILED: EX PARTE MOTION HEARING SET FOR 3/07/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED CAUSE IS CALLED FOR HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICTION OF DEFENDANT, CLARA HUESO, FOR AN ORDER STATYING EXECUTION AND FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR SERVICE OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT . DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION IS GRANTED. . HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS SET ON 3-8-13 AT 1:30 P.M. (MATTER CONTINUED TO THIS DATE AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO ALLOW HER TO OBTAIN A SPANISH INTERPRETER)> . THE COURT ORDERS A STAY ON THE LOCK OUT TO THE HEARING DATE OF 3-8-13. . NOTICE IS WAIVED. . A CERTIFIED COPY OF THIS MINUTE ORDER TO SAN PEDRO SHERIFF THIS DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED CAUSE IS CALLED FOR HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICTION OF DEFENDANT, CLARA HUESO, FOR AN ORDER STATYING EXECUTION AND FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR SERVICE OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT . DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION IS GRANTED. . HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS SET ON 3-8-13 AT 1:30 P.M. (MATTER CONTINUED TO THIS DATE AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO ALLOW HER TO OBTAIN A SPANISH INTERPRETER)> . THE COURT ORDERS A STAY ON THE LOCK OUT TO THE HEARING DATE OF 3-8-13. . NOTICE IS WAIVED. . A CERTIFIED COPY OF THIS MINUTE ORDER TO SAN PEDRO SHERIFF THIS DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK - VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less