This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 02:28:45 (UTC).

NF CAPITAL FINANCE LP VS MASON, STEPHEN

Case Summary

On 07/29/2016 NF CAPITAL FINANCE LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MASON, STEPHEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK A. YOUNG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3744

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK A. YOUNG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NF CAPITAL FINANCE LP

Defendant

MASON STEPHEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN, LLP - ROY S. KIM

Attorney at KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN, LLP

KIM ROY S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 120.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (NF CAPITAL FINANCE LP) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL: JUDGMENT WAS ENTERED ON 08/25/16. JUDGMENT MUST BE VACATED BEFORE A DISMISSAL CAN BE ENTERED. SUBMITTED ON 08/29/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO (MASON, STEPHEN) AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS ON 08/24/16 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 00.00 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 08/25/16 , FOR (NF CAPITAL FINANCE LP) , AGAINST (MASON, STEPHEN) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 3640 S. SEPULVEDA BOULEVARD #343 LOS ANGELES, CA 90034 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 45.59 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PAID . BOX...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP FILED. REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (MASON, STEPHEN) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS ON 08/24/16 . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (MASON, STEPHEN) , ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT/UD; PREJDUGMENT CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (MASON, STEPHEN) . COSTS OF $ 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM500862047. Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 01/25/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK . .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WES , HONORABLE MARK A. YOUNG .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NF CAPITAL FINANCE LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM, ROY S