This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/18/2022 at 17:32:10 (UTC).

NEXT MANAGEMENT LLC VS MACPHERSON, BRENDAN

Case Summary

On 01/09/2017 NEXT MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MACPHERSON, BRENDAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA L. FREIXES. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0377

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA L. FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEXT MANAGEMENT LLC A NEW YORK LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

MACPHERSON BELYNDA AKA MACPHERSON BELINDA AKA M

MACPHERSON BRENDAN AKA MACPHERSON BEN IND & DBA B

MACPHERSON BELYNDA

MACPHERSON BRENDAN AKA MACPHERSON BEN IND DBA BANJO & MATILDA INC AKA BANJO AND MATILDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KNUTSON LAW, P.C. - DANA F. KNUTSON

KNUTSON DANA F.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

8/14/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ - Return

8/6/2018: Writ - Return

Notice of Change of Firm Name

6/4/2018: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Other - (name extension)

2/28/2018: Other - (name extension)

Writ of Execution - (LOS ANGELES)

8/16/2017: Writ of Execution - (LOS ANGELES)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

7/28/2017: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Default Judgment

3/21/2017: Default Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (NEXT MANAGEMENT LLC) A NEW YORK LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: BRENDAN MACPHERSON (Defendant); BELYNDA MACPHERSON (Defendant); Costs: 223.00; Interest: 0.00; Credits: 2,065.12; Service Date: 08/01/18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 08/06/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Partially Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 25.00; Interest Credits: 483.90; Principal Credits: 2,753.10; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Partially Satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- DANA F. KNUTSON (Attorney): Organization Name changed from KNUTSON LAW, P.C. to DANA F. KNUTSON dba KNUTSON LAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketAddress for DANA F. KNUTSON (Attorney) customer request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by: DANA F. KNUTSON (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketNunc Pro Tunc Order Correcting Clerical Error. Signed and Filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (NEXT MANAGEMENT LLC) A NEW YORK LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: BRENDAN MACPHERSON (Defendant); BELYNDA MACPHERSON (Defendant); Costs: 78.00; Interest: 397.50; Service Date: 07/24/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (MACPHERSON, BRENDAN) AKA (MACPHERSON, BEN) IND & DBA (BANJO & MATILDA INC) AKA (BANJO AND MATILDA) , (MACPHERSON, BELYNDA) AKA (MACPHERSON, BELINDA) AKA (MACPHERSON, BELINDA S) AKA (MACPHERSON, BELYNDA S) IND & DBA (BANJO & MATILDA INC) AKA . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT SUBMITTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1-X , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (MACPHERSON, BRENDAN) AKA (MACPHERSON, BEN) IND & DBA (BANJO & MATILDA INC) AKA (BANJO AND MATILDA) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (MACPHERSON, BELYNDA) AKA (MACPHERSON, BELINDA) AKA (MACPHERSON, BELINDA S) AKA (MACPHERSON, BELYNDA S) IND & DBA (BANJO & MATILDA INC) AKA .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 12/23/19 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY GRACIELA L. FREIXES, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA538853075. Filing Fee: 225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less