This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2013 at 05:32:42 (UTC).

NEWCODS VS. SURJIT PROPERTY MANAGMENT

Case Summary

On 10/07/2013 NEWCODS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SURJIT PROPERTY MANAGMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8866

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWCODS LLC A CA LTD. LIAB. CO.

Defendants

SURJIT PROPERTY MANAGMENT INC. A CA CORP.

PRINCE CORP A CA CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DENNIS P. BLOCK AND ASSOCIATES - DENNIS P. BLOCK ESQ

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF PARDEEP JOSHI - JOSHI, PARDEEP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2013
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. WES , HON. NANCYNEWMAN PRESIDING FOR JURY TRIAL. MATTER CONTINUED FORJURY TRIAL TO 01/14/14 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. WES .ANY JURY FEES ON FILE TO STAND. NOTICE IS WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • RECEIVED FEES FROM (PRINCE CORP) A CA CORP. IN THE SUMOF $ 150.00 FOR JURY FEES . RECEIPT # SM405596012 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS,COMPLAINT,PREJUDGMENTCLAIM,OSC,NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT,GENERAL ORDER DATED7-23-13 FILED. SERVED AS TO (SURJIT PROPERTY MANAGMENT)INC., A CA CORP. BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE TO JACKIEDOE-PERSON IN CHARGE AT BUS . COSTS OF $ 67.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • DECLARATION RE: OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS,COMPLAINT,PREJUDGMENTCLAIM,ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT,GENERAL ORDER DATED 7-23-13 FILED. SERVED AS TO (PRINCECORP) A CA CORP. BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE TO JACKIEDOE-PERSON IN CHARGE AT BUS . COSTS OF $ 67.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • DECLARATION RE: OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENTCLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALLOCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALLOCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2013
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: TO ADVANCE HEARING ON DEMURRERTO NOVEMBER 1, 2013 FILED. FILE SENT TO DEPT. WES .RECEIPT # SM481473007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; POINTS ANDAUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED BY (NEWCODS) LLC, ACA LTD. LIAB. CO. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WES , HON. NANCYNEWMAN PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FORORDER TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR DEMURRER. . APPLICATIONGRANTED. HEARING DATE OF 11/22/13 IS ADVANCED ANDCONTINUED TO 11/6/13 AT 0130 PM IN DEPARTMENT S.PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND P & A'S IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILEDBY (SURJIT PROPERTY MANAGMENT) INC., A CA CORP. ,(PRINCE CORP) A CA CORP. . MATTER NOTICED FOR HEARING ON11/06/13 AT 01:30P M IN DEPT. WES . RECEIPT #SM481473027

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVEPARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM498850003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 04/07/14AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK . 100714

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TODEPT. WES , HONORABLE NANCY NEWMAN .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEWCODS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PRINCE INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARDEEP JOSH